Financial history IPSWICH GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1074096
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £4.93k £6.84k £7.18k £12.64k £4.57k
Total expenditure £4.51k £5.75k £7.16k £5.92k £7.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A