THE SEASHORES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Governance
- 17 September 1999: Standard registration
- 05 April 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- SEASHORES (Working name)
- THE SEASHORES TRUST - FOR ORPHANED AND ABANDONED CHILDREN (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH AUGUST 1999
Charitable objects
SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): (1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS; (11) THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF ORPHANED AND ABANDONED CHILDREN; IN PARTICULAR THOSE SUFFERING FROM: (A) HIV, AIDS AND OTHER INFECTIOUS AND DEBILITATING CONDITIONS; AND (B) PHYSICAL, LEARNING AND BEHAVIOURAL DISABILITIES; AND (111) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL, DENTAL AND GENERAL HEALTHCARE TREATMENT TO ORPHANED AND ABANDONED CHILDREN AND THEIR CARERS, AND WHERE POSSIBLE THEIR RELATIVES, WHO ARE IN NEED THEREOF.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window