STRATFORD - UPON - AVON GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Horse riding for physically & special needs adults & children in the South warwickshire and North Oxfordshire area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 22 February 1999: Standard registration
- 19 July 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 19 July 2018: Funds transferred to 1142590 STRATFORD-UPON-AVON RDA
- RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION STRATFORD - UPON - AVON GROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £450 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £450 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 27 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 04 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 26 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE S.WARWICKSHIRE/N.OXFORDSHIRE/BUCKS AREA
Area of benefit
S.WARWICKSHIRE/N.OXFORDSHIRE/BUCKS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window