Trustees THE TAYLOR AND HAMMOND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1073971

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM EDWARD GREEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Samuel Stopps | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Flatman | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Walter Kiddie | Trustee | 02 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Kelly Louise Floyd | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
EMMA COOPER-GREEN | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Wells | Trustee | 03 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CHRISTINE HOOK | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
EDWIN HIGGINS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.