Financial history PHOENIX DRIVING GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074260
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £1.03k £671 £484 £500 £6
Total expenditure £1.72k £1.09k £593 £440 £415
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A