Accounts and annual returns RIDING & DRIVING FOR THE DISABLED - CHIVERTON GROUP

Charity number: 1074277
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 February 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 27 February 2013 09 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2013 09 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 29 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 20 February 2013 20 days late
Annual return 31 March 2011 22 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required