JILLIAN RAYMOND GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
riding for the disabled
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 February 1999: Standard registration
- 07 November 2014: Funds received from 1074281 NEWMARKET GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATIO...
- JILLIAN RAYMOND GROUP RDA (Working name)
- RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION JILLIAN RAYMOND GROUP (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Mary Boardman Salmon | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Dawn Edmeades | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER CAMPBELL | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR JANE MIDWOOD | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR MACLACHLAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DELIA WINGFIELD DIGBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN GREENWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA CORBETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLYN CAZENOVE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.46k | £465 | £620 | £1.76k | £2.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.63k | £467 | £1.26k | £2.36k | £2.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE CHIPPENHAM CAMBS AREA
Area of benefit
CHIPPENHAM CAMBS
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Tharp Way
Chippenham
ELY
CB7 5QG
- Phone:
- 01638724190
- Email:
- susilark@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window