Trustees LIFE CYCLE

Charity number: 1077575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Guy Buckland Trustee 17 March 2025
WEST OF ENGLAND SPORT TRUST
Received: On time
Duncan Cooper Trustee 17 March 2025
None on record
Geoffrey Roach Trustee 17 March 2025
None on record
Michael Hobson Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Nadia Saba Trustee 10 September 2022
None on record
Keith Norman Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Nicola Key Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Harold Binley Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Kiron Chatterjee Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record