WEETING 21
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Services for chldren and older people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 16 December 1999: Standard registration
- 24 November 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.71k | £182.26k | £256.58k | £271.72k | £98.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.24k | £176.68k | £240.24k | £203.46k | £115.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 22 March 2009 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 29 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 16 December 2008 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 30 June 2008 | 151 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 27 March 2007 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 19 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 14 February 2006 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 14 February 2006 | 14 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH NOVEMBER 1998 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 8TH DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEETING WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS FOR ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (1) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO EQUIPPING THEM FOR EMPLOYMENT AND FACILITATING THEIR OBTAINING WORK BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR STUDY, LEARNING AND TRAINING; (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN LOCAL HISTORY RELATING TO WEETING AND SURROUNDING AREAS; (4) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS LIVING OR VISITING THE AREA; (5) THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE NATURAL AND BUILT ENVIRONMENT OF WEETING, INCLUDING PROJECTS WHICH WILL PROVIDE, IMPROVE OR MAINTAIN PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE OPEN SPACE, PUBLIC PARKS OR OTHER PUBLIC AMENITIES IN WEETING
Area of benefit
WEETING AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window