HATHERLOW HOUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 19 June 1999: Standard registration
- 03 April 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 03 April 2008: Funds transferred to 1083995 METHODIST HOMES
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £297.07k | £299.48k | £350.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £300.70k | £307.29k | £328.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 26 March 2008 | 55 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 02 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 18 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 15 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 15 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 08 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 08 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 24 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE ELDERLY OR INDIGENT PERSONS IN THE NORTH-WEST AREA REGARDLESS OF SEX OR RELIGIOUS BELIEF THROUGH THE PURCHASE OR LEASE, FURNISHING, EQUIPPING AND MAINTENANCE OF A HOME OR HOMES AND TO CARRY ON SUCH CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NORTH-WEST AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window