HEARING CONSERVATION COUNCIL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HCC supports promising research by UK scientists to limit the effect of hearing impairment in older people and, in developing countries, supports training and outreach programmes, to provide basic ear care and treatment of hearing impairment for people who previously had no access to care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Malawi
Governance
- 05 July 1999: Standard registration
- 17 April 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 17 April 2020: Funds transferred to 290992 IMPACT FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.04k | £196.85k | £16.24k | £18.36k | £173.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.01k | £337.09k | £20.10k | £33.95k | £174.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 13 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 09 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 01 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 19 June 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 4TH FEBRUARY 1999.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH HEARING IMPAIRMENT AND DEAFNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN ANY COUNTRY OF THE WORLD BY PROMOTING HEALTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN ANY COUNTRY OF THE WORLD BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES FOR THE PREVENTION, MITIGATION OR RELIEF OF AVOIDABLE CAUSES OF HEARING IMPAIRMENT AND DEAFNESS AND FOR THE CONSERVATION OF HEARING.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window