Financial history LINKLATERS LINKAID

Charity Number: 1076058
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £254.34k £31.09k £84.00k £17.00k £2.00k
Total expenditure £47.78k £92.60k £192.00k £20.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A