HATFEILD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hatfield School Association is involved in raising funds for Hatfield School, for the benefit of the children attending the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Merton
Governance
- 22 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Thornberry | Chair | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Malcarne | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Seher Zaineb Mahmood | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Jones | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Gilley | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.91k | £5.68k | £5.50k | £34.08k | £20.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.41k | £4.78k | £5.46k | £41.51k | £23.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE MORDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hatfield Primary School
Lower Morden Lane
MORDEN
SM4 4SJ
- Phone:
- 020 8337 1332
- Email:
- hatfeildsa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window