OTLEY AND DALES RIDING FOR THE DISABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help disabled to enjoy horse riding by giving them the chance to ride with safe horses and qualified instructors
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
- Leeds City
Governance
- 24 February 1999: Standard registration
- OTLEY AND DISTRICT RDA (Working name)
- OTLEY AND DALES RIDING FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- OTLEY AND DISTRICT GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION OTLEY AND DISTRICT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS JUDY OLBY | Chair |
|
||||||
Victoria Ann McGregor | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ann Fraser | Trustee | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Caroline Tiffany | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS JAN WHEELOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.97k | £12.92k | £11.19k | £20.95k | £18.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.69k | £11.52k | £15.86k | £18.98k | £19.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED ON 23 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED ON 23 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE AIRE & WHARFE VALLEYS, NORTH WEST LEEDS AREA
Area of benefit
AIRE & WHARFE VALLEYS, NORTH WEST LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 ARRAN DRIVE
HORSFORTH
LEEDS
LS18 5SW
- Phone:
- 01132266781
- Email:
- jeannie.lupton@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window