DIGSWELL PLACE GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through riding activities with ponies and horses, we provide therapy, achievement and enjoyment wherever possible to people with any disability in all age groups that live, or attend a school or an adult care centre, in the surrounding area. Where there is sufficient capacity and where the welfare of our ponies and horses is not put at risk, we will work with any person with a disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 February 1999: Standard registration
- 12 November 2015: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 12 November 2015: Funds transferred to 1163233 DIGSWELL PLACE GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOC...
- DIGSWELL PLACE GROUP (Working name)
- DIGSWELL PLACE GROUP R D A (Working name)
- RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION DIGSWELL PLACE GROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.94k | £62.26k | £55.69k | £74.36k | £80.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.92k | £48.74k | £47.33k | £68.39k | £69.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 31 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 31 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 21 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 21 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 01 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 22 August 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 06 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 28 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE WELWYN GARDEN CITY/ ST ALBANS/ STEVENAGE AREA
Area of benefit
WELWYN GARDEN CITY/ ST ALBANS/ STEVENAGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window