Trustees SANDHURST GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1074430

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olivia Shenton-Taylor | Chair | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Norman | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth May Felstead | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick Blackwell | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Bragg | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Smith | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNE WAKEFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.