ACKWORTH RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide theraputic riding and carriage driving for adults and children with disabilities who can benefit from the activity-we have between 50 and 60 riders and drivers-we have 8 ponies-we rely solely on volunteer help but use a professional instructor for tuition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 26 February 1999: Standard registration
- RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION ACKWORTH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERI LOUISE ROBINSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Blackburn | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Arrand | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Johnson | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Greensitt | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Novelle | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE YVONNE KINSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Caroline Lancaster | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE ANNE HEWITT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.98k | £16.65k | £9.86k | £21.06k | £24.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.66k | £17.57k | £11.41k | £16.53k | £23.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 8 DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE ACKWORTH AREA.
Area of benefit
ACKWORTH, WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Garden St
Ackworth
PONTEFRACT
Yorkshire
WF7 7BB
- Phone:
- 01977672229
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window