HERTS AND ESSEX BORDER RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide horse riding to children with learning disabilities. We provide this opportunity to children at three schools in the east of Hertfordshire - the schools are Middleton, Bengeo and Edwinstree.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 February 1999: Standard registration
- HERTS AND ESSEX RDA GROUP (Working name)
- RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION HERTS AND ESSEX BORDER (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET WHATLEY | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Kingsbury | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
SALLY SEERS | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Lawes | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jody Gray | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|||||
DEREK WHEELER | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.92k | £1.55k | £1.67k | £3.39k | £2.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.48k | £1.29k | £3.78k | £6.49k | £10.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE HERTS & ESSEX BORDER AREA
Area of benefit
HERTS & ESSEX BORDER
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Croft
The Street
WARE
Haultwick
County (optional)
SG11 1JQ
- Phone:
- 07795345925
- Email:
- dg_wheeler@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window