THE TIM AND BELINDA MARA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity makes grants/awards to individuals and or organisations where young people are involved in the education of the Arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 25 June 1999: Standard registration
- 06 December 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1072327 THE HAMPSTEAD SCHOOL OF ART
- THE TIM MARA TRUST (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £4.63k | £2.00k | £3.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £1.13k | £1.38k | £219 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 03/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05/06/1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT (THE OBJECT) OF THE TRUST IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ART OF PRINT-MAKING AND, IN PARTICULAR, SCREEN PRINTING BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND AWARDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window