ST JOSEPH'S R.C. PRIMARY SCHOOL (BROADSTAIRS) PARENT AND TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1074451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Summer and Christmas fairs Well being evenings for parents Discos for the pupils and many other local activities aimed at raising money for the school and giving the pupils some new experiences

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £3,496
Total expenditure: £4,796

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 March 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST JOSEPHS CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
  • ST JOSEPH'S PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
zara castle Chair 15 July 2022
None on record
JASON WANSTALL Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.13k £1.48k £3.57k £4.35k £3.50k
Total expenditure £1.33k £2.18k £4.06k £5.35k £4.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 25 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 February 2025 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Joseph's Catholic Primary School
St Peters Park Road
Broadstairs
Kent
CT10 2BA
Phone:
01843 861738