Accounts and annual returns REDDITCH CO-OPERATIVE HOMES

Charity number: 1078304
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 14 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 14 January 2016 On Time