Financial history LONGBRIDGE CHILDCARE STRATEGY GROUP

Charity number: 1081699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £431.78k £499.41k £544.73k £477.08k £533.52k
Total expenditure £465.62k £458.72k £527.49k £502.94k £555.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £491.10k N/A £470.03k
Income from government grants £393.98k £114.79k £11.49k £415.00k £5.20k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £23 N/A £15
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £544.71k N/A £533.50k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £527.49k N/A £555.77k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.70k N/A £6.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0