Financial history FOUR MARKS CARE

Charity Number: 1076426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.90k £5.29k £4.38k £5.46k £9.19k
Total expenditure £6.67k £4.63k £3.97k £5.49k £8.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A