Governing document FOUR MARKS CARE
Charity number: 1076426

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/1988 AS AMENDED 14/06/1999, 13/05/2004, 26/05/2010, 01/06/2012 AND 23/05/2013.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF FOUR MARKS PLUS "THE SHRAVE"(HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF FOUR MARKS PLUS "THE SHRAVE".
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.