Trustees FOUR MARKS CARE
Charity number: 1076426

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Spencer | Chair | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael William Oates | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mollie Thompson | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Efstathiou | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Thompson | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Kydd | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Thomas | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES GERALD ROTHWELL KYDD | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Elfed Hughes | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Josephine M Higgins | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.