Governing document DONCASTER U3A

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 AUGUST 1994 AS AMENDED 16 MAY 1995, 20 MAY 1997, 21 APRIL 1998, 20 APRIL 1999 AND 29 APRIL 2003, AS AMENDED ON 20TH APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED ON 19 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 16 OCT 2017 as amended on 11 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
3. Object The Du3a’s object [‘the object’] is the advancement of education, and in particular the education of older people and those retired from full time work, by all means including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development in The Du3a.
Area of benefit
DONCASTER AND ITS SURROUNDINGS LOCALITY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.