Trustees DONCASTER U3A
Charity number: 1074577

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Marie Harmer | Chair | 16 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Whaley | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Thompson | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Harmer | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Beresford | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Curtis | Trustee | 16 August 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.