Trustees ASHTON KEYNES MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1074988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Stockwell Trustee 20 January 2025
None on record
Alison Bone Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
David Karn Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
JOHANNA TIPPING Trustee 02 February 2023
ASHTON KEYNES VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Natasha Anna Silvia Inzani Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Hazel Blackburn Trustee 28 February 2017
None on record
Ashley Seymour Trustee 11 December 2014
None on record
MICHAEL PETER ASHLEY SEYMOUR Trustee
None on record
ERNIE TIDMARSH Trustee
None on record