UNLOCK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF EX-OFFENDERS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Driven by the needs of people, Unlock works to help people overcome the long-term disadvantages caused by criminal records. We do this by providing information, advice, advocacy and other forms of support; undertaking research; as well as working with government, employers and others to achieve a fairer and more inclusive society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 January 2000: Standard registration
- Unlock - for people with criminal records (Working name)
- UNLOCK THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF EX-OFFENDERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faye Anna Goldman | Chair | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard John McStraw | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tajah Kamali Stevens | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fionnuala Agnes Ratcliffe | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Edward Anthony Atherton | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Belinda Carole Winder | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harmohinder Kaur Sanghera | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Leslie Dighton | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Braby | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Richard Wheatley | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hamish Douglas MacLellan | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Steven John Lorber | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Caroline Hardy | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £353.29k | £378.15k | £390.97k | £380.72k | £416.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £260.88k | £308.91k | £358.86k | £414.12k | £523.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/06/1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION AND REINTEGRATION OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE RECEIVED A CRIMINAL RECORD (INCLUDING THOSE WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION ON THEIR LIBERTY AT ANY PENAL ESTABLISHMENT AS A PUNISHMENT IMPOSED BY A COURT OF LAW, RECEIVED A NON-CUSTODIAL SENTENCE, FINE OR ANY OTHER COURT OR OTHER RECORDED DISPOSAL, SUCH AS A POLICE CAUTION), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, ADVOCACY AND TRAINING, AND THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH AND POLICY WORK, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE AFOREMENTIONED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNLOCK
MAIDSTONE COMMUNITY SUPPORT CENTRE
MARSHAM STREET
MAIDSTONE
ME14 1HH
- Phone:
- 01634 247350
- Email:
- admin@unlock.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window