THE BRIARS CENTRE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a community centre for activities of local residents together with sports field and open space
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATIA MALCAUS COOPER | Chair | 28 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Hare | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sandilands | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Stuart Harris | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.10k | £20.54k | £21.04k | £23.88k | £10.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.54k | £20.27k | £38.00k | £19.15k | £22.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £3.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH NOVEMBER 1998 as amended on 13 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LIGHTWATER, THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE ELECTORAL WARD OF LIGHTWATER WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF SURREY HEATH, AND ADJOINING OR NEIGHBOURING AREAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT" ) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
LIGHTWATER AND ADJOINING OR NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Lowfield Close
LIGHTWATER
Surrey
GU18 5QT
- Phone:
- 01276850527
- Email:
- info@thebriarscentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window