ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY (BATH BRANCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the cause of Scottish Country Dancing amongst all sections of the community as a pleasurable and healthy activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 10 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Harraway | Chair | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ines Laidler | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Latham | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Colebourne | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Toomer | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
June Madeline Clements | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.92k | £2.13k | £7.67k | £7.79k | £9.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.58k | £1.10k | £10.09k | £6.66k | £6.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 1997 as amended on 17 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BATH AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD, HERINAFTER CALLED "THE DISTRICT" IN TRADITIONAL COUNTRY DANCING, IN PARTICULAR BY:- 1) PRESERVING AND FURTHERING THE PRACTICE OF TRADITIONAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCES; B) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING INSTRUCTION IN THE DANCING OF SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING; C) PROMOTING THE ENJOYMENT AND APPRECIATION OF SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING AND MUSIC BY ANY SUITABLE MEANS.
Area of benefit
BATH AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
86 BROADMOOR LANE
BATH
BA1 4LB
- Phone:
- 01225447846
- Email:
- dianat@doctors.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window