THE CHELTENHAM COLLEGE BOAT CLUB TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the sport of rowing for boys and girls at Cheltenham College.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 14 May 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Cutts | Chair | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL EVANS | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Watton | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES CHRISTOPHER WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £766 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 642 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 642 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1007 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1007 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1372 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1372 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1737 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1737 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11TH MAY 1998
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PUPILS AT CHELTENHAM COLLEGE TO PARTICIPATE IN THE SPORT OF ROWING AND THEREBY TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS.
Area of benefit
CHELTENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cheltenham College
Boyne House
College Road
CHELTENHAM
GL53 7JD
- Phone:
- 0124265600
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window