TOMORROW'S GENERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objectives of the trust are: +?+++?To educate and assist young persons through their leisure time activities +?+++?To educate young persons on the improvement and protection of the environment +?+++?To educate, relieve and rehabilitate young persons who by reason of their social and economic circumstances are unable to gain employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 30 July 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Byrne | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Gow | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
STIG ANDERS HEDLUND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SEAN JENKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.30k | £108.83k | £63.55k | £62.29k | £136.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.83k | £162.17k | £103.17k | £53.95k | £195.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 March 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 1 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
1) TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED 2) TO EDUCATE YOUNG PERSONS ON THE DANGERS OF UNPROTECTED SEXUAL ACTIVITY OR OF BECOMING ADDICTED OR DEPENDANT ON DRUGS OF ANY DESCRIPTION, ALCOHOL, SOLVENTS OR OTHER ADDICTIVE SUBSTANCES; TO ASSIST IN THE WITHDRAWAL FROM SUCH ADDICTION AND REHABILITATION OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO HAVE BECOME ADDICTED TO ANY SUBSTANCE. 3) TO EDUCATE YOUNG PERSONS ON THE IMPROVEMENT AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND ON THE DANGER OF THE ENVIRONMENT CAUSED BY POLLUTION. 4) TO EDUCATE, RELIEVE AND REHABILITATE YOUNG PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT OR TO FURTHER THEIR FORMAL EDUCATION BY PROVIDING FOR SUCH PERSONS WORKSHOPS AND SUCH OTHER TRAINING FACILITIES AS WILL ENABLE THEM TO OBTAIN WORK EXPERIENCE AND ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS. 5) TO RELIEVE YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR OTHERWISE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. TO BE ELIGIBLE TO BENEFIT UNDER ANY OF THE ABOVE HEADS THE YOUNG PERSON MUST BE UNDER 25 YEARS OF AGE AND RESIDENT IN ENGLAND OR WALES 6) TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP, HOMELESSNESS OR DISTRESS FAMILIES RESIDENT IN ENGLAND OR WALES.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Cwrt Cefn
Lisvane
CARDIFF
CF14 0US
- Phone:
- 07899060597
- Email:
- david.gow1@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window