THE KENNETH LOVELAND GIFT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
advance the education of 16-18 year olds and postgraduate music performance students, instrumentalists, singers and young musicians by the awarding of a gift .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 May 2000: Standard registration
- 21 May 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.73k | £1.26k | £13.24k | £1.34k | £1.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.61k | £4.95k | £6.52k | £6.06k | £4.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 08 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 23 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | 27 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | 11 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE ON 12 APRIL 2000, AS AMENDED 24 APRIL 2008.
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF 16-18 YEAR OLD AND POST-GRADUATE MUSIC PERFORMANCE STUDENTS, INSTRUMENTALISTS OR SINGERS BY THE AWARDING OF A GIFT. THE GIFT IS OPEN TO STUDENTS OF ALL NATIONALITIES BUT OVERSEAS STUDENTS MUST USE THE MONEY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. THE GIFT, WHEN GRANTED, MAY BE USED BY THE STUDENT FOR ANY PARTICULAR PURPOSE SUBJECT TO THE APPROVAL OF THE TRUSTEES. (II) THE TRUSTEES MAY REQUIRE ANY STUDENT TO GIVE AN AUDITION BEFORE AWARDING A GIFT. IF ANY AUDITION IS REQUIRED, THE STUDENT MUST INCLUDE AT LEAST ONE WORK BY A BRITISH COMPOSER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window