GURU NANAK PANJABI SCHOOL LEICESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the charity is providing panjabi language education to children and adults. The school presently opens 4 days a week having three groups as Monday/Wednesday, Tuesday/Thursday,& Friday/Saturday. The classes are normally held during the evening between 7pm to 8.30pm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 24 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR JASWANT SINGH DHALIWAL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Surinderpal Singh | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOGINDER SINGH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/04/2020 | 15/04/2021 | 15/04/2022 | 15/04/2023 | 15/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.77k | £4.00k | £0 | £4.00k | £11.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.14k | £1.37k | £5.18k | £7.80k | £9.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 April 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2021 | 17 September 2022 | 214 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 402 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 26TH MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED ON 22ND JUNE 1996, 3RD JUNE 1999, 17 JUNE 2000 AND 27 AUGUST 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE PANJABI LANGUAGE, SIKH HISTORY, RELIGION, AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GURU NANAK PANJABI SCHOOL LEICESTER
PRESIDENT GURU NANAK GURDWARA
9 HOLY BONES
LEICESTER
LE1 4LJ
- Phone:
- 01162517460
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window