AFRICAN OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with local communities in Africa to create routes out of poverty for those living in slum and destitute conditions, by providing training and support to transfer skills, improve livelihoods, and promote self-help efforts out of poverty for vulnerable women and youth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
- Ghana
- Liberia
Governance
- 11 December 2000: Standard registration
- OUTREACH (Working name)
- THE SUB-SAHARAN AFRICAN INNOVATIVE DEVELOPMENT SOLUTIONS NETWORK (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Hales | Chair |
|
||||||
MAKU OBUOBI | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DANIAL DAVIES DAVIES | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
GORDON MOLE | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICK WOLFF | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAN TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.03k | £595 | £6.34k | £169 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.34k | £4.30k | £8.01k | £576 | £353 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 17 OCTOBER, 1999 AMENDED ON 24 SEPTEMBER, 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF AFRICAN PERSONS IN AFRICA.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 Swinburne Road
OXFORD
OX4 4BG
- Phone:
- 01865792176
- Email:
- info@african-outreach.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window