PSALM 84 V.10

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church in Lincolnshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 29 April 1999: Standard registration
- THRESHOLD (PSALM 84 V 10) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN JOHN TOYNE | Chair | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Maguire | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Marie Johnson | Trustee | 11 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Brown | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK CHRISTOPHER PROTHEROE | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Maurice Evans | Trustee | 12 September 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.00k | £80.62k | £87.02k | £99.95k | £110.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.71k | £92.51k | £80.68k | £57.19k | £69.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JANUARY 1999; AS AMENDED 19 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Lindisfarne House
Manor Farm Lane
Bardney
LINCOLN
LN3 5FB
- Phone:
- 07856140167
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window