Accounts and annual returns THE GERTRUDE BEASLEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1074589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 April 2025 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 April 2025 447 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 March 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required