SIDESTRAND READING ROOM 21

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management and maintenance of Sidestrand Reading Room
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 30 September 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Danson-Hatcher | Trustee |
|
||||||
B M WISEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL GENDERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IVOR WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/10/2019 | 05/10/2020 | 05/10/2021 | 05/10/2022 | 05/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.45k | £990 | £890 | £1.18k | £1.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.32k | £945 | £820 | £1.56k | £985 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 October 2023 | 21 November 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 October 2022 | 06 August 2024 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 October 2021 | 08 September 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 October 2020 | 25 July 2022 | 354 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 October 2019 | 06 September 2020 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SIDESTRAND IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Tower Lane
Sidestrand
Cromer
NR27 0NA
- Phone:
- 01263578255
- Email:
- ginnywren40@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window