Financial history PARENTS, TEACHERS & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF TIBSHELF INFANT & NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1076979
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £23.85k £3.56k £2.75k £2.80k £2.98k
Total expenditure £23.77k £3.64k £620 £2.98k £3.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A