RAMSGATE HOLY TRINITY PTFA

Charity number: 1075887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We raise funds to provide items and facilities that will advance the education of pupils at the school. We also organise events and activities that support the school and enhance the pupils time at school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £8,803
Total expenditure: £11,892

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 June 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF RAMSGATE HOLY TRINITY PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Harrington Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Elise Fautrier-Baberon Smith Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Erin Price Trustee 07 November 2018
None on record
Steffi Egan Trustee 07 November 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.93k £5.22k £9.13k £7.16k £8.80k
Total expenditure £1.57k £8.52k £3.98k £8.92k £11.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ramsgate Holy Trinity C Of E
99 Dumpton Park Drive
BROADSTAIRS
Kent
CT10 1RR
Phone:
01843860744