THE FOXHOLE RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
recreation ground & play area with football pitch for people in the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 16 September 1999: Standard registration
- FOXHOLE RECREATION GROUND CHARITY (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
jake couch | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Bunt | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Bullock | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ALLEN | Trustee | 13 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER WILKINS | Trustee | 13 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rronnie MAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
I H TRUDGEON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON BUNT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/01/2020 | 12/01/2021 | 12/01/2022 | 12/01/2023 | 12/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.09k | £2.40k | £2.40k | £2.40k | £2.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.97k | £2.07k | £1.29k | £2.20k | £2.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 January 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 January 2023 | 27 November 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 January 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 January 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 January 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 OCTOBER 1948
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A RECREATION GROUND TO BE USED FOR THE RELIGIOUS SOCIAL MORAL AND PHYSICAL WELL-BEING OF THE PEOPLE RESIDENT AT FOXHOLE AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT (WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION) BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THEIR BENEFIT AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME TO BE AGREED UPON
Area of benefit
FOXHOLE AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
160 Old Roselyon Road
St. Blazey
Par
PL24 2LR
- Phone:
- 07868263510
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window