NATIONAL FAMILY MEDIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
National family Mediation (NFM) offers high quality family mediation and support services to all families affected by relationship breakdown, divorce or separation in England and Wales. Mediators help families reach joint decisions about all the issues associated with divorce and separation. NFM provides services in over 500 locations across England and Wales .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,088,594
Donations and legacies | £20 | |
Charitable activities | £1.08m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £12.25k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£977,108
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £977.11k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £977.11k | |
Retained for future use | £111.49k |
People

17 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 March 1999: Standard registration
- NFM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Lindsay Reay | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frank Auton | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Leech | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Thomas Wilson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Hewitt | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julian Curtis | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Lorraine Tuckey | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £923.42k | £864.71k | £955.83k | £984.01k | £1.09m | |
|
Total expenditure | £852.95k | £690.80k | £788.24k | £958.64k | £977.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £566.14k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £33.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.85k | £35.74k | £4.09k | £43 | £20 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £920.20k | £828.76k | £951.63k | £980.37k | £1.08m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £43 | £20 | |
|
Income - Investment | £379 | £211 | £110 | £3.60k | £12.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £35.74k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £852.95k | £690.80k | £788.24k | £958.64k | £977.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.82k | £2.66k | £3.04k | £3.28k | £9.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £1.71k | £1.28k | £854 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £413.53k | £538.31k | £705.41k | £722.00k | £837.82k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £234.16k | £185.03k | £186.25k | £177.04k | £180.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/02/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH OBJECTS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO:- 1) ALLEVIATE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAK UP OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY OR BY FAMILIES IN DISPUTE OR DIFFICULTY; AND, 2) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN INVOLVED IN THE BREAK UP OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY OR FAMILY DISPUTES OR DIFFICULTIES; AND, 3) TO PROMOTE AND CO-ORDINATE SERVICES TO BE PROVIDED FOR SUCH PURPOSES BY MEMBERS; AND, 4) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THOSE INVOLVED IN PROVIDING MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION SERVICES; AND, 5) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE THROUGH MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION SERVICES OR COUPLES WHOSE RELATIONSHIPS APPEAR TO BE BREAKING DOWN OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN DISPUTE OR DIFFICULTY; AND, 6) WHERE SUCH RELATIONSHIPS HAVE ALREADY BROKEN DOWN, TO ADVISE AND HELP IN THE SETTLEMENT OF DIFFERENCES OR POTENTIAL DIFFERENCES OVER ASSOCIATED MATTERS SUCH AS THE RESIDENCE OF AND CONTACT WITH CHILDREN AND FINANCIAL MATTERS ("THE OBJECTS"). 7) TO ADVOCATE, PROMOTE AND CO-ORDINATE SERVICES AND PROVIDE SUPPORT TO NOT FOR PROFIT MEDIATION AND DISPUTE RESOLUTION SERVICES WORKING IN OTHER FIELDS OF MEDIATION OR DISPUTE RESOLUTION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Barnfield Crescent
EXETER
EX1 1QT
- Phone:
- 03004000636
- Email:
- general@nfm.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window