BALDWIN'S BRIDGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Erecting, repairing and, from time to time, amending and maintaining Baldwin's Bridge, situated in Eton, Berkshire, and making contributions for the benefit of residents of Eton and Eton Wick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 26 April 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Theresa Lee | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Maher | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter John EATON | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hayes-Powell | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Frederick Leach | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Monaliza Cadwallader | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Tarbox | Trustee | 04 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Linda Evans | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|||||
JOHN MICHAEL LOVELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
JAMES ANDREW SLIPPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHN MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY MARK TARRANT GYNGELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £281.34k | £243.22k | £261.94k | £307.06k | £291.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.97k | £167.77k | £213.97k | £194.41k | £251.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 24 FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, MAINTAIN AND REPAIR "BALDWIN'S BRIDGE" (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS "BARNES POOL BRIDGE") AT ETON; TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF ETON AND ETON WICK AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
ETON AND ETON WICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
AUSTIN LEIGH & BALDWIN INSTITUTE
ETON COURT
ETON
WINDSOR
SL4 6BY
- Phone:
- 07717322125
- Email:
- suemilne.bbt@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window