WESTMORLAND YOUTH ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1075179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

WYO provides weekly term-time training in orchestral playing and the presentation of public concerts for young people under the age of 19, who are ordinarily resident in the former county of Westmorland.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £18,906
Total expenditure: £38,254

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
OLIVER WATES Chair
None on record
Yvonne Hulme Trustee 05 November 2022
PLAYGROUND PROMS
Received: On time
David Hugh Ozanne Trustee 21 January 2022
None on record
IAN WALTER JONES Trustee 27 November 2020
CUMBRIA FESTIVAL CHORUS
Received: On time
Ursula Jane Leveaux Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record
Dorthe Pratt Trustee 03 November 2017
None on record
HEATHER JANE LOWTHIAN Trustee 22 April 2016
None on record
Sarah Lucy Davies Trustee 09 October 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £61.37k £108.30k £14.85k £27.62k £18.91k
Total expenditure £41.07k £38.67k £29.28k £33.31k £38.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.50k £5.30k £5.30k £5.13k £4.80k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 13 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 July 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 July 2020 15 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Castle Street Centre
Castle Street
KENDAL
LA9 7AD
Phone:
01539443183