THE WATERWAYS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
On 1/4/13 the operations and net assets of TWT were transferred to Canal & River Trust (Charity No. 1146792) and TWT ceased trading. Previously working to promote greater public enjoyment of the UK's waterways by raising funds for waterway restoration, conservation, recreation and education. Operations included The Waterways Archive and Designated inland waterway collection in our 3 museums.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 March 1999: Standard registration
- JAMES BRINDLEY SOCIETY (Working name)
- THE BOAT MUSEUM (Working name)
- THE CANAL MUSEUM (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL WATERWAYS MUSEUM (Working name)
- WALK ON WATER (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Dunwoodie | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Casey | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tom Deards | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED ON 3 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 DECEMBER 1999 AND 24 MAY 2007 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THOSE FEATURES OF HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL, SCIENTIFIC, ENGINEERING OR SCENIC MERIT COMPRISED IN THE INLAND WATERWAYS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR THE CANAL NETWORK ("THE INLAND WATERWAYS") AND IN THEIR ENVIRONMENT BOTH NATURAL AND BUILT. 2) TO PROMOTE ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST THE RESTORATION DEVELOPMENT AND USE OF THE INLAND WATERWAYS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT A) FOR NAVIGATION; AND B) FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY GENERALLY. 3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 4) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE INLAND WATERWAYS, THEIR HISTORY, DEVELOPMENT, USE AND OPERATION BY ALL APPROPRIATE MEANS INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MUSEUMS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o CANAL & RIVER TRUST
NATIONAL WATERWAYS MUSEUM
SOUTH PIER ROAD
ELLESMERE PORT
CHESHIRE
CH65 4FW
- Phone:
- 01908351826
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window