CAMPSALL VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE

Charity Number: 1095808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

102 Education/training 103 Health 109 Arts/ Culture 110 Sports/Recreation 111Animals 112 Environment/Conservation/ Heritage

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £16,717
Total expenditure: £13,224

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Doncaster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 2003: Standard registration
  • 02 April 2019: Funds received from 1153588 OPTIMISM IS .........
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Brophy Chair 07 May 2014
None on record
HELEN CRAVEN CIHCM CIPD Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Sonia Sugden Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
John McCarten Trustee 14 February 2022
None on record
Paul Adams Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
Lorraine Adams Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
Vicky Ford Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Kerry Longley Trustee 08 May 2019
None on record
Jon Sandham Trustee 06 May 2018
None on record
Mrs L Shearman Trustee 06 May 2017
None on record
Beverley Moxon Trustee 06 May 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.45k £20.65k £16.08k £12.54k £16.72k
Total expenditure £10.41k £9.46k £10.37k £10.03k £13.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £8.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 February 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 February 2022 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 March 2021 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
16 Loxley Mount
Campsall
DONCASTER
South Yorkshire
DN6 9RD
Phone:
07548989098