SHALOM CHILDCARE AND EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childcare and After School Club - providing childcare and education services for children and young people in nursery and out-of-school centres, community spaces, churches and registered private homes. Providing training and recruitment of childcare staff and volunteers for the childcare industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bexley
- Greenwich
- Kent
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 20 October 1999: Standard registration
- SHALOM AFTER SCHOOL CLUB (Working name)
- SHALOM AFTER SCHOOL/SHALOM (Working name)
- SHALOM KIDS CLUB (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sabrina Marvellous | Chair | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Izuebe | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2025 | 731 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4TH OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUTHS AGED 0-15 YEARS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PERSONS INVOLVED IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
12 Constance Street
LONDON
E16 2DQ
- Phone:
- 07947630436
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window