Financial history University of California Trust

Charity number: 1075405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £786.88k £713.45k £1.43m £3.77m £1.67m
Total expenditure £758.14k £693.73k £1.45m £3.71m £1.71m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £364.85k £329.38k £1.02m £3.10m £918.13k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.99k £0 £15.88k £671.82k £749.88k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £417.04k £5.34k £1.32k £1.73k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £409.88k £362.38k £1.03m £3.12m £934.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds £49.03k £6.70k £60.84k £86.50k £113.15k
Expenditure - Governance £37.31k £32.37k £8.33k £15.48k £16.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £372.57k £330.01k £1.02m £3.10m £917.95k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £299.22k £324.65k £358.16k £504.10k £664.51k