CSI-UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organization is dormant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 January 2003: Standard registration
- CSI UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel John Mason | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Thomas William Bourhill | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Markus Weber | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Vern Eibner | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTIAN SOLIDARITY INTERNATIONAL (CSI) | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/12/2019 | 13/12/2020 | 13/12/2021 | 13/12/2022 | 13/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 December 2022 | 20 March 2024 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 December 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR:- 1.1 VICTIMS OF RELIGIOUS REPRESSION; 1.2 CHILDREN; 1.3 VICTIMS OF DISASTER - WHETHER NATURAL OR OF HUMAN ORIGIN; 1.4 VICTIMS OF WAR, INCLUDING VICTIMS OF CIVIL WAR; AND 1.5 REFUGEES. 2. TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HUMAN RIGHTS AS ENSHRINED IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION ON HUMAN RIGHTS ("THE UDHR") AND IN THE INTERNATIONAL COVENANT ON CIVIL AND POLITICAL RIGHTS ("THE CCPR") AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) ARTICLE 18 OF THE AFORESAID DECLARATION AND/OR COVENANT BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE. 3. TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW AMONG STATES WHICH HAVE ENSHRINED CERTAIN HUMAN RIGHTS FROM THE UDHR INTO THEIR DOMESTIC LAW AND/OR HAVE RATIFIED THE CCPR IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING LEGAL ADVICE AND REPRESENTATION TO PEOPLE WHO ARE UNABLE TO OBTAIN LEGAL REPRESENTATION FROM THEIR OWN RESOURCES, IN CASES WHERE IT IS APPREHENDED THAT THE STATE IS IN BREACH OF ITS OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE AFORESAID DECLARATION AND/OR COVENANT. 4. TO PROMOTE EDUCATION ON HUMAN RIGHTS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, ESPECIALLY THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE MAINTENANCE AND OBSERVANCE OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 5. TO PROVIDE EDUCATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD TO: - 5.1 CHILDREN; 5.2 REFUGEES; AND 5.3 OTHER DISPLACED PEOPLE IN NEED. 6. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SPARK
DRAYMANS WAY
NEWCASTLE HELIX
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 5DE
- Phone:
- 01902799000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window